DTiQ Technologies, Inc. v. Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: DTiQ Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02050
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Hawk Technology Systems, LLC answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Defendants' Deadline to Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff DTiQ Technologies, Inc.. (Stewart, Robert)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Hawk Technology Systems, LLC answer due 12/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) of Defendant's Deadline to Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff DTiQ Technologies, Inc.. (Stewart, Robert)
November 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DTiQ Technologies, Inc. re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Hawk Technology Systems, LLC served on 11/9/2020. (Stewart, Robert)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hawk Technology Systems, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/6/2020) (MR).
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by DTiQ Technologies, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent DTiQ Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent DTiQ Acquisition Corp. for DTiQ Technologies, Inc. added. (Stewart, Robert)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hawk Technology Systems, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6246041) by DTiQ Technologies, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Stewart, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DTiQ Technologies, Inc. v. Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Represented By: R. Scott Weide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DTiQ Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?