U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank
Defendant: Chicago Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc and Chicago Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02068
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Chicago Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. served on 12/2/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 31, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Chicago Title Insurance Company served on 12/3/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 31, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc served on 12/14/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 30, 2020 Filing 16 ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit) (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Motions due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank. (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint (First Request). Chicago Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. answer due 1/23/2021; Chicago Title Insurance Company answer due 1/23/2021; Fidelity National Title Group, Inc answer due 1/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to respond to complaint by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion for Attorney Fees, #4 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Motion for Attorney Fees, #4 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 12/14/2020. (Gizer, Scott)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chicago Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Chicago Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Fees re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank. Responses due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Robbins, Lindsay)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank. Responses due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Robbins, Lindsay)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 11/12/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/27/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-824504-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6251327) by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trustee National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?