Spears v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Geraldine Spears
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv02140
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 0373 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (HAM)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Oscar Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Gonzalez, Oscar)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 0380 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. AUSA served on 12/16/2020. (MR)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 2290 0001 8797 0380 and 7018 2290 0001 8797 0373 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA re #5 Complaint. (MR)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (cc: AUSA summons w/ECFs #4 Order, #5 Complaint to USM - MR)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Geraldine Spears. Proof of service due by 3/10/2021. (MR)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file #1 -1 the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the US Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to USM for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geraldine Spears. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Geraldine Spears. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex.A to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal) Modified on 11/20/2020 (DKJ).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Spears
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?