Cordova Carballo et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Jose Rodolfo Castellanos, Abel De La Cruz, Jose Moises Silva Garcia, Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo, Julian Martin, Sudhamma Kukulpane, Carlos Antonio Otero Escobar, Antonio Osario Han, Hector Perez Alvares, Luis Olivar Peralta, Mojahamed Betiche, David Garcia Flores, Cesar Sosa Ramirez, Jose Seron Figueroa, Israel Mendoza Mendoza, Urvano Ruiz Sanchez, Arnold Camacho Vazquez, Elmer Vazquez Reyes, Roberto Bonnet, Yupanqui Sanchez, Jerardo Guerrora, Yassine Fadi, Bambang Budiano, Octavio Carrillo, Felipe Mora Mora, Edgar Ramirez Garcia, Eduardo Gallardo Gonzalez and Luis Roberto Olivar Peralta
Defendant: Pamela Lauer, William Barr, Gabriel C Ruiz, Thomas E. Feeley, Chad Wolfe, Brian Koehn, Tom Simic, Matthew T Albence and Matthew Cantrell
Case Number: 2:2020cv02196
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 16 ERRATA to #14 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo. (Sull, Hardeep) Modified event on 1/28/2021 and corrected document links (MMM).
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 ERRATA to #13 SURREPLY to #9 Reply to #5 Response to #2 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo. (Sull, Hardeep) Modified event on 1/28/2021 and corrected document links (MMM).
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo. (Sull, Hardeep) Modified event on 1/28/2021 and corrected docket entry relationship (MMM).
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 SURREPLY to #9 Reply to #5 Response to #2 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo. (Sull, Hardeep) Modified event on 1/28/2021(MMM).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #6 Motion. Replies due by 1/27/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) re #9 Reply, #6 Motion, by Plaintiff Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo. (Sull, Hardeep)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Motion, by Defendants Matthew T Albence, William Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Chad Wolfe. Replies due by 1/22/2021. (Smith, Brianna)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #2 Motion to Strike by Defendants Matthew T Albence, William Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Chad Wolfe. (Smith, Brianna)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #2 Motion to Strike, #6 Motion for Leave, Replies due by 1/15/2021. Responses due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/6/2021) (JQC).
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) re #4 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings by Defendants Matthew T Albence, William Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Chad Wolfe. (Smith, Brianna)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION Response to Motion to Strike (ECF 2) and MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory Injunctive Relief and Damages re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo. Responses due by 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sull, Hardeep) Modified text on 12/28/2020 (SLD).
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #2 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sull, Hardeep)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that all deadlines from case 2:20-cv-1315-APG-BNW (see especially ECF No. 59 ) apply in this action. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Defendants Matthew T Albence, William Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Chad Wolfe. Responses due by 12/17/2020. (MR)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Abel De La Cruz, Cesar Sosa Ramirez, Elmer Vazquez Reyes, Edgar Ramirez Garcia, Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo, Jose Moises Silva Garcia, Mojahamed Betiche, Bambang Budiano, Jerardo Guerrora, Jose Seron Figueroa, Felipe Mora Mora, Yassine Fadi, Antonio Osario Han, Carlos Antonio Otero Escobar, Yupanqui Sanchez, David Garcia Flores, Israel Mendoza Mendoza, Hector Perez Alvares, Urvano Ruiz Sanchez, Octavio Carrillo, Arnold Camacho Vazquez, Roberto Bonnet, Julian Martin, Jose Rodolfo Castellanos, Sudhamma Kukulpane, Luis Roberto Olivar Peralta, Eduardo Gallardo Gonzalez. (MR) Modified on 12/4/2020 to reflect correct party name (MMM). .
December 3, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordova Carballo et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rodolfo Castellanos
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel De La Cruz
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Moises Silva Garcia
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandor Anival Cordova Carballo
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Martin
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sudhamma Kukulpane
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Otero Escobar
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Osario Han
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Perez Alvares
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Olivar Peralta
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mojahamed Betiche
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Garcia Flores
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Sosa Ramirez
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Seron Figueroa
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Mendoza Mendoza
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urvano Ruiz Sanchez
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Camacho Vazquez
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Vazquez Reyes
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Bonnet
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yupanqui Sanchez
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerardo Guerrora
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yassine Fadi
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bambang Budiano
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Carrillo
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Mora Mora
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Ramirez Garcia
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Gallardo Gonzalez
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Roberto Olivar Peralta
Represented By: Hardeep Sull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Lauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel C Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Feeley
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolfe
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Koehn
Represented By: Gina Winspear
Represented By: Ashlee Hesman
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Simic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Represented By: Jacob B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?