Tedone v. United States Government
Plaintiff: Robert Tedone
Defendant: United States Government
Case Number: 2:2020cv02197
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Robert Tedone. (MR)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against United States Government by Robert Tedone. (MR)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file #1 -1 the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Tedone's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/10/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if an amended complaint is later filed, the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue summons on the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Tedone. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit) (JM)
December 4, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tedone v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tedone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?