Legar et al v. Landry's Inc dba Golden Nugget
Plaintiff: Christine Chenh, Felicidad Riter, Raymond Allen, Anthony Dich, Rita Legar and Diyana Valkanova
Defendant: Landry's Inc dba Golden Nugget and Landrys, Inc. doing business as Golden Nugget
Case Number: 2:2020cv02274
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint by Defendant Landrys, Inc.. Responses due by 2/26/2021. (Milton, Kirsten)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation to Extend deadline to Answer or Otherwise plead to #12 Amended Complaint; Landrys, Inc. answer due 2/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Landrys, Inc.. (Milton, Kirsten)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Felicidad Riter, Rita Legar, Raymond Allen, Christine Chenh, Anthony Dich, Diyana Valkanova. No changes to parties. (Huber, Burke)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Melisa H. Panagakos and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kirsten A. Milton. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/11/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Melisa H. Panagakos and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kirsten A. Milton (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6324043) by Defendant Landrys, Inc.. (Milton, Kirsten)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Response/Reply Deadlines to #6 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/13/2021. Replies due by 1/27/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Raymond Allen, Christine Chenh, Anthony Dich, Rita Legar, Felicidad Riter, Diyana Valkanova. (Huber, Burke)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Landrys, Inc.. (Milton, Kirsten)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Landrys, Inc.. Responses due by 1/6/2021. (Milton, Kirsten)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Landry's Inc dba Golden Nugget that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fertitta Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Landry's Gaming, Inc., Other Affiliate Tilman J. Fertitta, Other Affiliate Golden Nugget, LLC, Other Affiliate GNLV, LLC d/b/a Golden Nugget Las Vegas Hotel and Casino for Landry's Inc dba Golden Nugget added. (Milton, Kirsten)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Raymond Allen, Christine Chenh, Anthony Dich, Rita Legar, Felicidad Riter, Diyana Valkanova. (Huber, Burke)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/16/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/31/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-20-824753-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6296137) by Landry's Inc dba Golden Nugget. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Milton, Kirsten) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legar et al v. Landry's Inc dba Golden Nugget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Chenh
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicidad Riter
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Allen
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dich
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Legar
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diyana Valkanova
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landry's Inc dba Golden Nugget
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landrys, Inc. doing business as Golden Nugget
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Represented By: Melisa H Panagakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?