Fleet Connect Solutions LLC v. East-West Transport Inc.
Plaintiff: Fleet Connect Solutions LLC
Defendant: East-West Transport Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02306
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion to Extend Time. East-West Transport Inc. answer due 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) RE TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S #1 COMPLAINT, by Plaintiff Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Spinelli, Debra)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Extend Time. East-West Transport Inc. answer due 2/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Spinelli, Debra) Modified text on 1/10/2021 (MMM).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Jennifer L. Calvert and approving Designation of Local Counsel Debra Spinelli. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/4/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer L. Calvert and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Debra L. Spinelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6312302) by Plaintiff Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Steven Grant Hill and approving Designation of Local Counsel Debra Spinelli. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/28/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Steven G. Hill and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Debra L. Spinelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6308423) by Plaintiff Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC re #1 Complaint,,. East-West Transport Inc. served on 12/22/2020. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings per 23 Minute Order. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-02306-GMN-NJK. (no image attached) (SLD)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/23/2020. By Deputy Clerk: M. Johansen. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Steven Grant Hill to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/4/2021. (no image attached) (JQC)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to East-West Transport Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Form AO-120 by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Spinelli, Debra)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Spinelli, Debra)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against East-West Transport Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6301552) by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. Proof of service due by 3/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons) (Spinelli, Debra) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleet Connect Solutions LLC v. East-West Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East-West Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleet Connect Solutions LLC
Represented By: Steven Grant Hill
Represented By: Debra Spinelli
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?