Schuett v. Governor State of Nevada et al
Petitioner: Clifford Schuett
Respondent: Warden High Desert State Prison, Director Nevada Department of Corrections and Governor State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2020cv02315
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents Director Nevada Department of Corrections, Governor State of Nevada, Warden High Desert State Prison. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Samuels, Katrina)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER - Fifth Amended General Order 2012-01 re mandatory E-filing for cases by inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP. (MMM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Clifford Schuett. (MR)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk add Aaron D. Ford, Nevada Attorney General, as counsel for respondents and provide respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the Notice of Electronic Filing to the office of the AG only. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Clifford Schuett. (MR)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Governor State of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:20-cv-02315-KJD-VCF. (MR)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (MR)
December 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuett v. Governor State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden High Desert State Prison
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Katrina Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Katrina Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Governor State of Nevada
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Katrina Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Schuett
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?