Burris v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: James Burris
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00068
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL RETURN re 8 Transmittal - Electronic Case Transfer Out to other District. Transferred case opened in California Northern District as case 3:21cv01337 on 2/24/2021. (JQC)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of Northern District of California. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (JQC)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-253). Signed by MDL Panel on 1/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Schuttert, Jay)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Burris. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Burris, Steven)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Monsanto Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/28/2021.(Schuttert, Jay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/13/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/28/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Monsanto Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company added. (Schuttert, Jay)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-826143-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6328934) by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint Served Upon Monsanto n the State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schuttert, Jay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burris
Represented By: Steven M. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?