Wuthrich v. Intelident Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Wuthrich
Defendant: Coast Dental of Nevada, Inc., Coast Dental Services, LLC, Intelident Solutions, LLC and Katherine Balmer
Case Number: 2:2021cv00160
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Katherine Balmer, Coast Dental Services, LLC, Coast Dental of Nevada, Inc., Intelident Solutions, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Katherine Balmer, Coast Dental Services, LLC, Coast Dental of Nevada, Inc., Intelident Solutions, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/11/2021.(Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Katherine Balmer, Coast Dental Services, LLC, Coast Dental of Nevada, Inc., Intelident Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Minute Order Re Removal) (Mahoney, Scott)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal (First Request). Defendants answer due 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answer to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Katherine Balmer, Coast Dental Services, LLC, Coast Dental of Nevada, Inc., Intelident Solutions, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vanessa Wuthrich. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Neal, Victoria)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/29/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/13/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District, Case Number A-20-824708-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6350549) by Coast Dental of Nevada, Inc., Coast Dental Services, LLC, Intelident Solutions, LLC. Proof of service due by 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint & Summonses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wuthrich v. Intelident Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Dental of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Dental Services, LLC
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelident Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Balmer
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Wuthrich
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?