Allison v. Clark County Justice Courts
Plaintiff: Ronald Allison
Defendant: Clark County Justice Courts
Case Number: 2:2021cv00164
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Ronald Allison. No new address available; Unable to re-mail. (DRS)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order, addressed to Ronald Allison. No new address available; Unable to re-mail. (DRS)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER : Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee in full or file an Application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before 4/5/2021. The Clerk's office shall supply approved application and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF with IFP packet - DRS)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS)
January 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison v. Clark County Justice Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Justice Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?