Allstate Insurance Company v. Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00170
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Motions due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to ECF No. 3 by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher D. Baucom for Brasscraft Manufacturing Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michelle D Alarie. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/1/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher D. Baucom and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michelle D. Alarie (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6375263) by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher D. Baucom to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/22/2021. (no image attached) (DKJ)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/25/2021.(Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 2/1/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/16/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Masco Corporation for Brasscraft Manufacturing Company added. (Alarie, Michelle)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-814609-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6352756) by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 1, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Paul Williams
Represented By: David C OMara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Represented By: Christopher Duke Baucom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?