U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. and Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00181
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Ancona, Esq.) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/15/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Motions due by 12/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/18/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company and Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. answer due 4/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendants Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. (Sinclair, Kevin)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. served on 2/17/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust re #1 Petition for Removal,,. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company served on 2/9/2021. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. (Sinclair, Kevin)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendants Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. (Sinclair, Kevin)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/3/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/18/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 3, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-827866-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6355000) by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Lehman XS Trust
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?