Ott v. Atkins North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Ott
Defendant: Atkins North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00243
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' #31 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is granted in part and denied in part. The scheduling deadlines set forth in the plan are GRANTED. The request for a telephonic conference with the Court before formal discovery motion practice is DENIED. The parties shall meet and confer and brief any discovery disputes in accordance with Local Rule 26-6. Discovery due by 11/8/2021. Motions due by 12/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 1, 2021 Filing 31 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Brian Ott. (Neal, Victoria)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. A pre-ENE telephonic conference is set for 5/11/2021 at 03:00 PM. Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 5/12/2021 at 09:00 AM by videoconference. Each party's written evaluation must be submitted electronically to judicial clerk David Chavez at david_chavez@nvd.uscourts.gov, by 4:00 PM on May 5, 2021. Do not deliver or mail the written evaluations to the clerk's office and do not serve a copy on opposing counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (HAM)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Stipulation. The Clerk of Court shall assign this case to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION REQUESTING AN EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION BE SET re #23 Notice, by Plaintiff Brian Ott. (Neal, Victoria)
March 18, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #25 . Document missing Judge's signature block pursuant to LR IA 6-2: A stipulation or ex parte or unopposed motion must include an "order" in the form of a signature block on which the court or clerk can endorse approval of the relief sought. This signature block must not begin on a separate page.Attorney Victoria L. Neal is advised to file the corrected image using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #25 . (no image attached) (SLD)
March 18, 2021 Filing 25 DOCUMENT terminated - attorney refiled. See #27 . STIPULATION REQUESTING AN EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION BE SET re #23 Notice, by Plaintiff Brian Ott. (Neal, Victoria) Modified on 3/19/2021 (SLD).
March 18, 2021 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #23 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Victoria L. Neal. For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #23 as a Stipulation addressing the Early Neutral Evaluation request to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing a separate document for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 17, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE JOINT NOTICE THAT ACTION FALLS UNDER THE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION PROGRAM AND REQUEST THAT AN EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION BE SET by Brian Ott. (Neal, Victoria) Modified on 3/18/2021 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) (SLD).
March 17, 2021 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Brian Ott. (Neal, Victoria)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Olivia Wada for Atkins North America, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Doreen Hartwell. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jamie Chanin Pollaci for Atkins North America, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #15 , #16 . Wrong form used by attorney.Attorney Doreen Spears-Hartwell is advised to use the correct Verified Petition form available on the Court's website pursuant to LR IA 11-2(a) and file the corrected document using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #11 , #12 . (no image attached) (SLD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #12 . Wrong form used by attorney.Attorney Doreen Spears-Hartwell is advised to use the correct Verified Petition form available on the Court's website pursuant to LR IA 11-2(a) and file the corrected document using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #12 . (no image attached) (SLD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #11 . Wrong form used by attorney. Attorney Doreen Spears-Hartwell is advised to use the correct Verified Petition form available on the Court's website pursuant to LR IA 11-2(a) and file the corrected document using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #11 . (no image attached) (SLD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 VIEW #18 corrected image MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Olivia Wada and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Doreen Spears Hartwell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6396837) by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 VIEW #19 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jamie Chanin Pollaci and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Doreen Spears Hartwell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6396798) by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brian Ott. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Neal, Victoria)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Victoria Lynn Neal on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Ott. (Neal, Victoria)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint re #4 Amended Petition for Removal filed by Atkins North America, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/4/2021.(Spears-Hartwell, Doreen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 2/16/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/3/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Amended Petition for Removal, #1 Petition for Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Atkins North America, Inc.. (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-824888-C, by Atkins North America, Inc.. No changes to parties. (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Atkins North America, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Atkins North America, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-824888-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6368921) by Atkins North America, Inc.. (Spears-Hartwell, Doreen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ott v. Atkins North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ott
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atkins North America, Inc.
Represented By: Doreen M Spears-Hartwell
Represented By: Olivia J. Wada
Represented By: Laura J Thalacker
Represented By: Jamie Chanin Pollaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?