Guerra v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Alain Guerra
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00248
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice, and each party will bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Pearson, Skyler)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Pearson, Skyler)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/16/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/3/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Las Vegas Township Justice Court, Case Number 20A003386, by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pearson, Skyler) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerra v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alain Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?