Microsoft Corporation v. CHEAP TECH GUYS LLC
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: CHEAP TECH GUYS LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00284
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cheap Tech Guys LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Adams, Nicholas)
April 15, 2021 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Cheap Tech Guys LLC. (Adams, Nicholas)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, filed by Cheap Tech Guys LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/30/2021.(Adams, Nicholas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation to Extend time Re: #1 Complaint; Cheap Tech Guys LLC answer due 4/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 13, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT, CHEAP TECH GUYS LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (FIRST REQUEST) re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by Defendant Cheap Tech Guys LLC. (Adams, Nicholas)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying #15 Stipulation to Extend Time without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (First Request) TO RESPOND TO #1 Complaint, by Defendant Cheap Tech Guys LLC. (Adams, Nicholas)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microsoft Corporation re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, #7 Summons Issued. Cheap Tech Guys LLC served on 3/8/2021. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kelly M. Gorton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher R. Miltenberger. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/10/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bonnie M. MacNaughton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher R. Miltenberger. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/10/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kelly M. Gorton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher R. Miltenberger (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6394620) by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bonnie M. MacNaughton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher R. Miltenberger (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6394595) by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge James C. Mahan for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-00284-JCM-VCF. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/1/2021. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cheap Tech Guys LLC. (DRS)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Bonnie MacNaughton; Kelly M. Gorton to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/8/2021. (no image attached) (MMM)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS)
February 22, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach David A. Ezra. (DRS) Modified Magistrate Judge assignment on 2/22/2021 to correct Judge assignment error. (DRS).
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Form AO120 by Microsoft Corporation re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Microsoft Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Miltenberger, Christopher)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHEAP TECH GUYS LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6376394) by Microsoft Corporation. Proof of service due by 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, Windows 10, #4 Exhibit 2 - Copyright Registration, Office 2019, #5 Exhibit 3 - Copyright Registration, Office 2016, #6 Exhibit 4 - Copyright Registration, Project 2019, #7 Exhibit 5 - Copyright Registration, Visio 2019, #8 Exhibit 6 - Trademark and Service Mark, Windows 10, #9 Exhibit 7 - Trademark Registration, Windows, #10 Exhibit 8 - Trademark and Service Mark, Microsoft Corporate Composite Logo, #11 Exhibit 9 - Trademark and Service Mark Registration, Microsoft Corporate Logo, #12 Exhibit 10 - Trademark and Service Mark Registration, Office 2012 Design, #13 Exhibit 11 - Trademark Registration, Office with Office 2012 Design, #14 Exhibit 12 - Trademark Registration, Excel, #15 Exhibit 13 - Trademark Registration, PowerPoint, #16 Exhibit 14 - Trademark Registration, OneNote, #17 Exhibit 15 - Trademark Registration, Outlook, #18 Exhibit 16 - Trademark Registration, Microsoft Access, #19 Exhibit 17 - Trademark Registration, Project Launch Icon (2012), #20 Exhibit 18 - Trademark Registration, Project Launch Icon (color), #21 Exhibit 19 - Trademark Registration, SQL Server, #22 Exhibit 20 - Trademark Registration, Server Design, #23 Exhibit 21 - Trademark Registration, Visio) (Miltenberger, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. CHEAP TECH GUYS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: Kelly M. Gorton
Represented By: Bonnie MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEAP TECH GUYS LLC
Represented By: Nicholas F Adams
Represented By: Analise N. M. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?