Power Probe Group, Inc. et al v. Innova Electronics Corporation
Plaintiff: Power Probe Tek, LLC and Power Probe Group, Inc.
Defendant: Innova Electronics Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00332
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Innova Electronics Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Craig)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, Answer, (Affirmative) Defenses and Counterclaim (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/3/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Power Probe Group, Inc. by Innova Electronics Corporation. filed by Innova Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-6, #2 Exhibit 7-9, #3 Exhibit 10-11, #4 Exhibit 12-14)(Anderson, Craig) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth R. Adamo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Craig R. Anderson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/6/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth R. Adamo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Craig R. Anderson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6433981) by Defendant Innova Electronics Corporation. (Anderson, Craig)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Tom BenGera and approving Designation of Local Counsel James D. Boyle. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/25/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Boyle, James)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kenneth R. Adamo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/5/2021. (no image attached) (DKJ)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Innova Electronics Corporation answer due 4/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant Innova Electronics Corporation. (Anderson, Craig)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lucas D. Garber and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick B. Horne and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Alexander Long, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lucas D. Garber and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6407426) by Plaintiffs Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC. (Boyle, James)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick B. Horne and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6407418) by Plaintiffs Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC. (Boyle, James)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Alexander Long, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6407401) by Plaintiffs Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC. (Boyle, James)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tom BenGera and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6407373) by Plaintiffs Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC. (Boyle, James)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,,. Innova Electronics Corporation served on 3/1/2021. (Boyle, James)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Innova Electronics Corporation re #1 Complaint. (HAM)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel S. Alex Long, Jr., Patrick B. Horne, Lucas D. Garber, Tom BenGera to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/12/2021. (no image attached) (HAM)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (HAM)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Myers, Joanna)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Innova Electronics Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6384782) by Power Probe Group, Inc., Power Probe Tek, LLC. Proof of service due by 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Summons Innova Electronics Corporation) (Myers, Joanna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Probe Group, Inc. et al v. Innova Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Probe Tek, LLC
Represented By: Tom BenGera
Represented By: S. Alex Long
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Lucas Garber
Represented By: Kendall Lovell
Represented By: Patrick Horne
Represented By: Joanna Myers
Represented By: Samuel Alex Long
Represented By: Patrick Blane Horne
Represented By: Lucas D Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Probe Group, Inc.
Represented By: Tom BenGera
Represented By: S. Alex Long
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Lucas Garber
Represented By: Kendall Lovell
Represented By: Patrick Horne
Represented By: Joanna Myers
Represented By: Samuel Alex Long
Represented By: Patrick Blane Horne
Represented By: Lucas D Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innova Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Robert Adamo
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?