Mitchell v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Tracy Gayle Mitchell
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 2:2021cv00391
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Release of Lis Pendens by Nationstar Mortgage LLC re #3 Notice of Lis Pendens. (Wittig, Donna)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 JUDGMENT in favor of Nationstar Mortgage LLC against Tracy Gayle Mitchell. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of NON-OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Wittig, Donna) Modified on 4/15/2021 to reflect correct event (DKJ).
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Wittig, Donna)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Wittig, Donna)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/22/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #8 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 4/5/2021. (Wittig, Donna)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 3/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) -- Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Wittig, Donna)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/9/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/24/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. (Wittig, Donna)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent WMIH Corp., Corporate Parent Mr Cooper Group, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation for Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper added. (Wittig, Donna)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-829057-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6398169) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Wittig, Donna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 9, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Gayle Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Scott Robert Lachman
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?