Bank of New York Mellon v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a the Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-OA2, Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00395
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Stay Case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Stay Case by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank of New York Mellon that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Corporate Parent Mellon Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Company, Inc. for Bank of New York Mellon added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/10/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/25/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 10, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by North American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Home Corporation, Corporate Parent Lennar Corporation, Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent CalAtlantic Title Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Lennar Financial Services, LLC, Corporate Parent LFS Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Saslaw-Simkoff Revocable Trust, Corporate Parent Foundation Capital VIII, L.P. for North American Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-830741-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6399509) by North American Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 6/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a the Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-OA2
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?