EAA Holdings LLC v. Greystone Nevada, LLC
Plaintiff: EAA Holdings LLC
Defendant: Greystone Nevada, LLC and Rose Ridge Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2021cv00412
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rose Ridge Homeowners Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boyack, Edward)
April 30, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint by Defendant Rose Ridge Homeowners Association. Responses due by 5/14/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1(A), #3 Exhibit 1(B), #4 Exhibit 1(C), #5 Exhibit 1(D), #6 Exhibit 1(E), #7 Exhibit 1(F), #8 Exhibit 1(G), #9 Exhibit 1(H), #10 Exhibit 1(I)) (Boyack, Edward) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 30, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. The hearing will be conducted using Zoom video conference. Closer to the hearing date, the courtroom administrator will provide counsel with the Zoom link to attend the video conference. Counsel is instructed not to forward the link to others. If additional participants need to appear, counsel is directed to contact Courtroom Administrator Danielle Cacciabaudo at danielle_cacciabaudo@nvd.uscourts.gov. For clarity of the record and best participation, the Court strongly recommends that all participants use a headset with a microphone during the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Members of the public may access and listen to the hearing by calling 888-808-6929 and entering access code 2178469 no later than five minutes before the scheduled hearing start time. (no image attached) (DC)
April 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 10/25/2021. Motions due by 11/24/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff EAA Holdings LLC. (Brown, Ogonna)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #7 Amended Complaint by Defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. Responses due by 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Durham, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. Replies due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Durham, Matthew)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation For Extension of Time re #7 Amended Complaint, #11 Motion to Remand to State Court. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #11 Motion to Remand to State Court, #7 Amended Complaint by Defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. (King, Gregory)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff EAA Holdings LLC. Responses due by 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ogonna M. Brown, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Brown, Ogonna)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/6/2021. Re #4 #5 Motions to Dismiss and Strike. In light of the filing of the amended complaint #7 , which supersedes the original complaint and moots the motions to dismiss or strike it #4 #5 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions to dismiss and strike the original complaint #4 #5 are DENIED without prejudice.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Rose Ridge Homeowners Association re #7 Amended Complaint. (DRS)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by EAA Holdings LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mojave Winds Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Eliot Alper for EAA Holdings LLC added. (Brown, Ogonna)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greystone Nevada, LLC by EAA Holdings LLC. Adds new parties. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Brown, Ogonna)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. Responses due by 4/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Durham, Matthew)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. Responses due by 4/1/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Durham, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Greystone Nevada, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Lennar Corporation, Corporate Parent Lennar Pacific Properties Management, Inc. for Greystone Nevada, LLC added. (Durham, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/11/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/26/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Nevada, Case Number A-21-828974-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6402299) by Greystone Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Durham, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 11, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EAA Holdings LLC v. Greystone Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystone Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L. Durham
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Ridge Homeowners Association
Represented By: Patrick A Orme
Represented By: Edward Dean Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAA Holdings LLC
Represented By: Ogonna M Brown
Represented By: Brian Douglas Blakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?