Garibay v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Garibay
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00439
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation to Stay Action for 90 days and Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. The Case is stayed for all purposes through 8/11/2021 and Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc's answer is due on or before 8/25/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/18/2021.; Case stayed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Sliker, Joshua)
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Stay Case by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Sliker, Joshua)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation; Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc. answer due 5/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Aquino, Daniel)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation re: #1 Petition for Removal; Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc. answer due 4/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Aquino, Daniel)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Aquino, Daniel)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Aquino, Daniel)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Travel + Leisure Co. for added. (Aquino, Daniel)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond Re: #1 Complaint. Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc. answer due 4/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Aquino, Daniel)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Garibay. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/17/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/1/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-21-829354-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6409412) by Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Aquino, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garibay v. Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garibay
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Joshua R. Hendrickson
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Aquino
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?