Alula v. Homegoods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anyalem Alula and Aynalem Alula
Defendant: Homegoods, Inc., Brandani Gift Group srl, Brandani Gift Group srl doing business as Brandani and Homegoods, Inc. doing business as T.J. Maxx, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00445
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aynalem Alula. Brandani Gift Group srl served on 2/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Letter from SOS, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of mailing) (Kind, Michael) Modified on 4/23/2021 to correct date of service (SLD).
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Brandani Gift Group srl re Cross Claim re #1 Petition for Removal. (MR)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Brandani Gift Group by Defendant Homegoods, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aynalem Alula. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Avalos, Gerardo)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/18/2022. Motions due by 2/18/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #9 Proposed Summons to be issued. Proposed Summons is on the form for a Third Party Complaint and will not be issued. Attorney Michael Lowry advised to refile the proposed summons on the correct "AO440 (rev 6/12) Summons in a Civil Action" form that has been downloaded from the Court's website. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Brandani Gift Group by Cross Claimant Homegoods, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Homegoods, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Homegoods, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Homegoods, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Nathaniel Saxe is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/18/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/2/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Homegoods, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The TJX Companies, Inc. for Homegoods, Inc. added. (Lowry, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-814627-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6410345) by Homegoods, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Second Amended Complaint w/ Jury Demand, #5 Motion to Dismiss, #6 Response to Motion to Dismiss, #7 Reply re Motion to Dismiss, #8 Order re Motion to Dismiss, #9 Answer & Cross-Claim, #10 Homegoods' Jury Demand, #11 Arb Petition, #12 Response to Arb Petition, #13 Motion for Leave to Amend, #14 Response to Motion for Leave to Amend, #15 Reply re Motion for Leave to Amend, #16 Order re Arb Petition, #17 Homegoods' Motion to Extend Time to Serve Brandani, #18 Alula's Motion to Extend Time to Serve Brandani, #19 Homegoods' Non-Opposition to Alula's Motion, #20 Alula's 1st Disclosure) (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alula v. Homegoods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anyalem Alula
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aynalem Alula
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homegoods, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Represented By: Nathaniel Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandani Gift Group srl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandani Gift Group srl doing business as Brandani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homegoods, Inc. doing business as T.J. Maxx, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Represented By: Nathaniel E Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?