Karajelian et al v. Affinity Lifestyles.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mindy Charusarn, Michelle Karajelian and Traci Ellis
Defendant: Affinity Lifestyles.com, Inc. doing business as Real Water
Case Number: 2:2021cv00465
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/17/2021. Re: #8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. The verified petitions do not comply with LR IA 11-2(a). Counsel failed to provide the parties' signatures and names on the fifth page of the petition under "Appointment of Designated Resident Nevada Counsel." The signature block on verified petition #6 is signed by the petitioning attorney, not the parties, and the signature blocks on the verified petitions #7 and #8 are blank. Counsel is advised to provide the missing signatures and information in three amended petitions, file the amended petitions under the event titled Notice of Corrected Image/Document, and link each amended petition to its originally filed petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CH)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Karajelian, Mindy Charusarn, Traci Ellis. Defendant served on 4/14/2021. (Wise, David) Modified text on 5/12/2021 (SLD).
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by J. Hunter Bryson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Hilton Wise (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6484421) by Plaintiffs Mindy Charusarn, Traci Ellis, Michelle Karajelian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wise, David)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel K. Bryson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Hilton Wise (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6484410) by Plaintiffs Mindy Charusarn, Traci Ellis, Michelle Karajelian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wise, David)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Klinger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David Hilton Wise (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6484044) by Plaintiffs Mindy Charusarn, Traci Ellis, Michelle Karajelian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wise, David)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Attempted - Not Known re 4 Notice, addressed to John J. Drudi. No new address available; Unable to remail. (MR)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John J. Drudi; Daniel K. Bryson; J. Hunter Bryson; Gary M. Kllinger to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/6/2021. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mindy Charusarn, Traci Ellis, Michelle Karajelian. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wise, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Affinity Lifestyles.com, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6415554) by Michelle Karajelian, Mindy Charusarn, Traci Ellis. Proof of service due by 6/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Wise, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 22, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karajelian et al v. Affinity Lifestyles.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Charusarn
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: J. Hunter Bryson
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: John J. Drudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Karajelian
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: J. Hunter Bryson
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: John J. Drudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Ellis
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: J. Hunter Bryson
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: John J. Drudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Lifestyles.com, Inc. doing business as Real Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?