Propes v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jay Thomas Propes
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00485
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Thomas Propes. All Defendants. (Kalagian, Marc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (MR)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (MR)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jay Thomas Propes. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6418889) by Jay Thomas Propes. Proof of service due by 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (AF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Propes v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Thomas Propes
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?