Hensley v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Kim Hensley
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv00508
Filed: March 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Commissioner Of Social Security. (Cheung, Allison)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Hensley. Commissioner Of Social Security served on 3/31/2021. (Taylor, Hal)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (HAM) Modified text on 3/29/2021 (MMM).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AF)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kim Hensley. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (AF)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6423292) by Kim Hensley. Proof of service due by 6/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons USAO, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG) (Taylor, Hal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 3/29/2021 (AF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Hensley
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?