Curry v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Margaret Rose Curry
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv00555
Filed: April 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner Of Social Security, c/o Office General Counsel, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney Reno. (Attachments: #1 c/o U.S. Attorney General, #2 c/o AUSA Reno) (DRM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security, by Margaret Rose Curry. (Filed by clerk pursuant to ECF No. #4 Order.) (DRM)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff's ECF No. #1 IFP application is GRANTED. Clerk shall issue summons to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney as specified herein. Clerk shall file the complaint. Clerk shall deliver the summons and sufficient copies of the complaint to the USM for service. (Summons and complaint emailed to USM on 4/6/2021.) Clerk shall send plaintiff sufficient copies of service of process forms (USM-285) for each defendant. (Three (3) USM-285 forms mailed to P's counsel of record on 4/6/2021.) Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days in which to return the required forms USM-285 to the U.S. Marshal at 400 S. Virginia Street, 2nd Floor, Reno, Nevada 89501. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AF)
April 5, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (AF)
April 3, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Margaret Rose Curry. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
April 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Margaret Rose Curry. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal) Modified on 4/5/2021 (AF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Rose Curry
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?