Lowe v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Lowe
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00605
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File CAR and to Answer #5 Complaint. Andrew Saul answer due 8/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Certified Administrative Record and Answer re #5 Complaint by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/26/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Minute Order (ECF No. 9) entered on May 26, 2021 was entered in error and is hereby VACATED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EJY)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 VACATED MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/26/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. A review of the docket in this matter shows Defendant was served with Plaintiff's Complaint more than twenty-one (21) days ago. However, no responsive pleading has been filed. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report with the Court within seven (7) court days of the date of this Order advising the Court of (1) whether and when a pleading responsive to Plaintiff's Complaint will be filed and (2) when the certified record on appeal will be available for filing electronically. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) Vacated on 5/26/2021 per 10 Minute Order (SLD).
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. AUSA served on 4/22/2021. (MR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (MR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Michael Earl Lowe. (MR)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall detach and file #1 -1 Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the Summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AF)
April 14, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AF)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Earl Lowe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Earl Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified on 4/14/2021 (AF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Lowe
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?