Bradley v. Hutchinson et al
Petitioner: Alphonso Bradley and Delphonso Bradley
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Hutchinson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00607
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gerri L Hardcastle on behalf of Respondents Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Hutchinson. (Hardcastle, Gerri)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk is directed to file the Petition located at [1-1], and to add Aaron Ford, Nevada Attorney General to the case, and to electronically serve same with the petition and other documents filed in this case. Respondents to file a response to the petition, including potentially by motion to dismiss, within 90 days of service of the petition, with petitioner having 45 days to reply. See Order for additional details/instructions. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Hutchinson, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:21-cv-00607-APG-VCF. (DRS)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Delphonso Bradley. (DRS)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Delphonso Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28 USC 2254) (DRS) Modified corrected misspelling of P's name on 4/28/2021 (DRS).
April 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Gerri L Hardcastle
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hutchinson
Represented By: Gerri L Hardcastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alphonso Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delphonso Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?