Cadengo Saucedo v. Creative Printing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jesus Alejandro Cadengo Saucedo
Defendant: Creative Printing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00631
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Jesus Alejandro Cadengo Saucedo. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/8/2021. Motions due by 12/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/2/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 6/3/2021 (JQC).
May 31, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #5 Answer to Complaint, by Plaintiff Jesus Alejandro Cadengo Saucedo. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Creative Printing, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Miles, Gregory)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Creative Printing, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/26/2021.(Miles, Gregory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Alejandro Cadengo Saucedo re #3 Summons Issued. Creative Printing, Inc. served on 4/29/2021. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Creative Printing, Inc.. (JQC)
April 20, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jesus Alejandro Cadengo Saucedo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lagomarsino, Andre)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6451521) by Jesus Alejandro Cadengo Saucedo. Proof of service due by 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lagomarsino, Andre) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadengo Saucedo v. Creative Printing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Printing, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Alejandro Cadengo Saucedo
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Represented By: Cory Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?