Nelson v. Social Security Administation
Plaintiff: Forrest J. Nelson
Defendant: Social Security Administation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00675
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT this case is dismissed. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Copy of 5 Minute Order to P - MR)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/25/2021. ORDER granting #2 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Forrest J. Nelson's response to the Administration's motion to dismiss #2 was due by 5/14/2021. He filed no response or request to extend the deadline to file one. Local Rule 7-2(d) provides that "[t]he failure of an opposing party to file points and authorities in response to any motion, except a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 or a motion for attorney's fees, constitutes a consent to the granting of the motion." I apply this rule, construe Nelson's silence as his consent to granting the motion, grant the motion #2 , and DISMISS THIS CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly, CLOSE THIS CASE, and mail a copy of this minute order to the plaintiff. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Attempted - Not Known re Assign Judges in Civil Case addressed to Forrest J. Nelson. No new address available; Unable to remail. (MR)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/30/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #2 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Social Security Administation. Responses due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pearson, Skyler)
April 23, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (YAW)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Justice Court, Township of Nevada, Case Number 20A003277, by Social Security Administation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pearson, Skyler) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Social Security Administation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administation
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?