Overstreet v. AJNC Industries LLC
Petitioner: Regional Director Cornele A. Overstreet
Respondent: AJNC Industries LLC d/b/a Clark Welding & Fabricating and AJNC Industries LLC doing business as Clark Welding & Fabricating
Case Number: 2:2021cv00730
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #3 Motion, by Petitioner Cornele A. Overstreet. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service for Petitioner's Reply to Opp to Try on Admin Rec) (Gordon, Nicholas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, by Petitioner Cornele A. Overstreet. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service for Petitioner's Reply to Opp to Temp Injunction) (Gordon, Nicholas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 Motion, by Respondent AJNC Industries LLC. Replies due by 5/25/2021. (Crosby, Nicholas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, by Respondent AJNC Industries LLC. Replies due by 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - D, #2 Exhibit Exhibits E - P) (Crosby, Nicholas)
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/4/2021. Pending before the Court is Petitioner Cornele A. Overstreet, Regional Director for the National Labor Relations Board's ("Petitioner's"), Petition for Temporary Injunction (the "Petition"), (ECF No. #1 ). Also pending before the Court is Petitioner's Motion to Shorten Time, Expedite Pleadings, and Set Hearing, (ECF No. #2 ). While the Motion to Shorten Time explains why expedited consideration of the Petition is necessary, the Motion does not explain why the requested relief may be futile if the Court orders a standard briefing schedule. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Motion to Shorten Time, Expedite Pleadings, and Set Hearing. The Court DENIES the request to shorten the briefing schedule. The Court GRANTS the request for expedited consideration. The Court DEFERS its determination regarding whether resolution of the Petition requires a hearing. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DZ)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Petitioner Cornele A. Overstreet. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion to Exceed Page Limits, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limits, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Motion to Exceed Page Limits) (Gordon, Nicholas)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION To Try Petition for Temporary Injunction on the Basis of Administrative Record, Affidavits and Documentary Evidence by Petitioner Cornele A. Overstreet. Responses due by 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Try on Basis of Administrative Record, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Motion to Try on Administrative Record) (Gordon, Nicholas)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION to Shorten Time Pleadings and Hearing re #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, by Petitioner Cornele A. Overstreet. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion for Expedited Hearing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Motion to Expedite) (Gordon, Nicholas)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Petitioner Cornele A. Overstreet. Responses due by 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index Appendix of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibits 1-4 (redacted), #5 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibits 5-7 (redacted), #6 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 8 (redacted), #7 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibits 9-15 (redacted), #8 Exhibit Notice of Non-Electronic Filing Document, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Temporary Injunction, #11 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Initiating Docs) (Gordon, Nicholas)
May 4, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overstreet v. AJNC Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AJNC Industries LLC d/b/a Clark Welding & Fabricating
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AJNC Industries LLC doing business as Clark Welding & Fabricating
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Regional Director Cornele A. Overstreet
Represented By: Nicholas Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?