Protective Life Insurance Company et al v. Flicek et al
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company and MONY Life Insurance Company
Defendant: David Flicek, Althaea Flicek and Estate of Althaea Flicek
Case Number: 2:2021cv00835
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David Flicek. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bowen, Jerome)
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, filed by David Flicek. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/15/2021.(Bowen, Jerome) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #7 Amended Complaint (First Request). David Flicek answer due 7/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #7 Amended Complaint, by Defendant David Flicek. (Bowen, Jerome)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protective Life Insurance Company, MONY Life Insurance Company re #7 Amended Complaint,. Estate of Althaea Flicek served on 6/2/2021. (Dove, Kelly)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protective Life Insurance Company, MONY Life Insurance Company re #7 Amended Complaint,. David Flicek served on 5/27/2021. (Dove, Kelly)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Estate of Althaea Flicek, David Flicek re #7 Amended Complaint. (MR)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Estate of Althaea Flicek by Plaintiffs MONY Life Insurance Company, Protective Life Insurance Company. (Dove, Kelly)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued David Flicek by Plaintiffs MONY Life Insurance Company, Protective Life Insurance Company. (Dove, Kelly)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Flicek, Estate of Althaea Flicek by Protective Life Insurance Company, MONY Life Insurance Company. Adds and removes parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10) (Dove, Kelly)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MONY Life Insurance Company, Protective Life Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Protective Life Corporation, Corporate Parent Dai-ichi Life Holdings, Inc. for Protective Life Insurance Company added. (Dove, Kelly)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Althaea Flicek by Plaintiffs MONY Life Insurance Company, Protective Life Insurance Company. (Dove, Kelly)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued David Flicek by Plaintiffs MONY Life Insurance Company, Protective Life Insurance Company. (Dove, Kelly)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6475256) by Protective Life Insurance Company, MONY Life Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dove, Kelly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 5, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Life Insurance Company et al v. Flicek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flicek
Represented By: Jerome R. Bowen
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Althaea Flicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Althaea Flicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONY Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?