Walsh v. Adventures International, LLC
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: Adventures International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00905
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 1903
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Respondent's Failure to Answer the Secretary's #1 Petition by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Meleshinsky, Eduard) Modified on 6/24/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Meleshinsky, Eduard)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adventures International, LLC re #1 Petition. (MR)
May 12, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Meleshinsky, Eduard)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Order to Enforce Administrative Subpoena by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Richard Longo, #4 Declaration of Sylvia Argueta, #5 Declaration of Boris Orlov, #6 Declaration of Eduard Meleshinsky, #7 Exhibit A to Meleshinsky Declaration) (Meleshinsky, Eduard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Adventures International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventures International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Eduard Meleshinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?