Mendez v. ESAB et al
Plaintiff: Victor Michael Mendez
Defendant: Worthington Industries, Inc., Worthington Cylinder Corporation, LLC, ESAB d/b/a Turbotorch, Western Industries, Inc., ESAB doing business as Turbotorch, Worthington Cylinder Corp, DT3 Manager, LLC, Fifth Street Gaming, LLC, Fine Properties, LLC, Furnace Bar and Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00935
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Victor Michael Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Killip, William)
June 21, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Worthington Cylinder Corp, Worthington Industries, Inc.. Replies due by 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Foley, Daniel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Worthington Cylinder Corp, Worthington Industries, Inc.. (Foley, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edgar Carranza on behalf of Defendant ESAB. (Carranza, Edgar)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to #9 Motion to Dismiss,,, #12 Notice (Other) by Defendant Worthington Cylinder Corp. (Foley, Daniel)
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Victor Michael Mendez. Responses due by 6/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Killip, William)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Defendants Worthington Cylinder Corp, Worthington Industries, Inc.. (Foley, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Victor Michael Mendez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Killip, William)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image by Victor Michael Mendez re #9 Response. (Killip, William)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 . Document is not formatted pursuant to LR IA 10-2. The first page of every document presented for filing must contain the following information in this format, with the attorney or pro se party's name beginning at least one inch below the top of the page.Attorney William R. Killip, Jr. is advised to file the corrected image using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #9 . (no image attached) (SLD)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by attorney William R. Killip, Jr. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion to Dismiss to Response. No further action is required regarding this change. (no image attached) (SLD)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 VIEW Corrected Image #12 re: RESPONSE to MOTION to Dismiss #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Victor Michael Mendez. Replies due by 6/10/2021. Responses due by 6/16/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7) (Killip, William) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified event and set Reply deadline on 6/3/2021 (SLD). Modified on 6/3/2021 (SLD).
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Worthington Cylinder Corp, Worthington Industries, Inc.. (Foley, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Worthington Cylinder Corp, Worthington Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Foley, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Worthington Cylinder Corp. Responses due by 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Index Index, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Foley, Daniel)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that by 6/4/2021, the removing defendants must show cause why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff Victor Mendez may respond by 6/18/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/14/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/29/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Worthington Cylinder Corporation, LLC, Worthington Industries, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Daniel)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-17-754282-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6486541) by Worthington Cylinder Corporation, LLC, Worthington Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Declaration Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Foley, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. ESAB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel T. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Cylinder Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Daniel T. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESAB d/b/a Turbotorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESAB doing business as Turbotorch
Represented By: Edgar Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Cylinder Corp
Represented By: Daniel T. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT3 Manager, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Street Gaming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furnace Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Michael Mendez
Represented By: William Russel Killip, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?