Avocado Oil De Mexico v. Alko Green Fresh LLC et al
Plaintiff: AVOCADO OIL DE MEXICO
Defendant: Jorge A Ortega, Alko Green Fresh LLC and Jorge A. Ortega Medina
Case Number: 2:2021cv00946
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and Order to Approve Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Avocado Oil De Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Higgins, Brigid)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #8 Affidavit filed by attorney Brigid Higgins. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Affidavit to Summons Returned Executed. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Avocado Oil De Mexico. Alko Green Fresh LLC served on 5/19/2021. (Higgins, Brigid) Modified event on 5/26/2021 (SLD).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Chebot and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brigid M. Higgins. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/24/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Chebot and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brigid M. Higgins (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6494145) by Plaintiff Avocado Oil De Mexico. (Higgins, Brigid)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Avocado Oil De Mexico. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Higgins, Brigid)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey M. Chebot Pa. to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/1/2021. (no image attached) (JQC)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alko Green Fresh LLC, Jorge A. Ortega Medina. (JQC)
May 18, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alko Green Fresh LLC, Jorge A Ortega (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6489827) by AVOCADO OIL DE MEXICO. Proof of service due by 8/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Jorge A. Ortega Medina, #6 Summons Alko Green Fresh, LLC) (Higgins, Brigid) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avocado Oil De Mexico v. Alko Green Fresh LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge A Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alko Green Fresh LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge A. Ortega Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVOCADO OIL DE MEXICO
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Chebot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?