Dickson v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Lyle Edward Dickson
Defendant: Jacob LaRow, State of Nevada, Nevada Housing Division and Amber Neff
Case Number: 2:2021cv00999
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Adopting in its entirety the #3 Report and Recommendation. Certain claims are dismissed as outlined. The #5 Amended Complaint is referred to the magistrate judge to determine whether further screening is necessary or to issue a further order regarding summons and service. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Lyle Edward Dickson. (DRS)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jacob LaRow, Amber Neff, Nevada Housing Division, State of Nevada by Lyle Edward Dickson. No changes to parties. (DRS)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Jacob LaRow, Amber Neff, Nevada Housing Division, State of Nevada by Lyle Edward Dickson. (DRS)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court RECOMMENDS that certain claims be allowed to proceed, and others be dismissed, some with leave to amend within 30 days, as outlined in the Order. The Court also recommends plaintiff be entitled to see prospective injunctive relief. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint at [1-1] Objections to R&R due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 6/7/2021 (DRS).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent to Service by Email) (DRS)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lyle Edward Dickson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickson v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob LaRow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Housing Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Edward Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?