Georgiou Family Trust et al v. Ruthen et al
Plaintiff: Georgiou Family Trust, Byron Georgiou and Benjamin Hill Realty LLC
Defendant: Phillip V Ruthen, Shaw Industries Inc., Suncrest Stone Products LLC, L. Lake Jordan and Jeffrey W. Stevens
Case Number: 2:2021cv01060
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Georgiou Family Trust, Benjamin Hill Realty LLC, Byron Georgiou. Shaw Industries Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Chalk, Pamela)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Georgiou Family Trust, Benjamin Hill Realty LLC, Byron Georgiou. L. Lake Jordan waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Chalk, Pamela)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anton N Handal for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel R. Scott Rasmussen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anton N. Handal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel R. Scott Rasmussen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6561684) by Plaintiffs Benjamin Hill Realty LLC, Byron Georgiou, Georgiou Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rasmussen, R.)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/12/2021 #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel.Due to petitioner Anton Handal's failure to comply with the court's instructions in the minute order at ECF No. 9 , his verified petition to practice pro hac vice at ECF No. #8 is DENIED without prejudice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2021 Re: #8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #8 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner, Anton Handal, shall appropriately answer question No. 8 on pg. 3 and provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from the State of Florida in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3, of the Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anton Handal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel R. Scott Rasmussen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6536607) by Plaintiffs Benjamin Hill Realty LLC, Byron Georgiou, Georgiou Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rasmussen, R.) Modified on 6/25/2021 to correct spelling of attorney Handel to attorney Handal (DKJ).
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Pamela Carol chalk on behalf of Plaintiffs Benjamin Hill Realty LLC, Byron Georgiou, Georgiou Family Trust. (chalk, Pamela)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela Carol Chalk for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel R. Scott Rasmussen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/23/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Pamela Chalk and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel R. Scott Rasmussen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6525893) by Plaintiffs Benjamin Hill Realty LLC, Byron Georgiou, Georgiou Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rasmussen, R.)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Benjamin Hill Realty LLC, Byron Georgiou, Georgiou Family Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rasmussen, R.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Georgiou Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Rasmussen, R.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6512190) by Georgiou Family Trust. Proof of service due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rasmussen, R.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 4, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgiou Family Trust et al v. Ruthen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgiou Family Trust
Represented By: R. Scott Rasmussen
Represented By: Anton N Handal
Represented By: Pamela Carol Chalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Georgiou
Represented By: R. Scott Rasmussen
Represented By: Anton N Handal
Represented By: Pamela Carol Chalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Hill Realty LLC
Represented By: R. Scott Rasmussen
Represented By: Anton N Handal
Represented By: Pamela Carol Chalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip V Ruthen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncrest Stone Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Lake Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?