Gonzalez v. Clarity Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Defendant: Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Conn Appliances, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, 2233 Paradise Road, LLC doing business as Cash Factory USA, Clarity Services, Inc., Great American Finance Holdings, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Plain Green, LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC, National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange and Backgroundchecks.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01068
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
2 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #104 Stipulation of Dismissal National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 25, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #104 Stipulation of Dismissal by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Haines, George)
March 25, 2022 Filing 104 View Corrected Image #105 as to STIPULATION of Dismissal with NCTUE re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George) Modified on 3/25/2022 (EDS).
March 9, 2022 Filing 103 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Great American Finance Holdings, LLC re #98 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default. (HAM)
March 9, 2022 Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/9/2022. Pending before the Court is the #101 Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez ("Plaintiff") and Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC ("Defendant"). Plaintiff and Defendant request sixty (60) days to file dismissal documents. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant must file dismissal documents no later than May 9, 2022, or else a joint status report informing the Court of the status of settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby VACATED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
March 9, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and AT&T by Jesus Gonzalez re #25 Amended Complaint. (Haines, George)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 Stipulation; Discovery due by 3/11/2022. Motions due by 4/11/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (Second Request) by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Clark, Jacob)
February 18, 2022 Filing 98 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default of Great American Finance re #67 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. Responses due by 3/4/2022. (Kind, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 10, 2022 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Clarity Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting #94 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 3/4/2022. Motions due by 4/4/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 3, 2022 Filing 94 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery re #50 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Avalos, Gerardo)
January 24, 2022 Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2022. Pending before the Court is the #92 Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez ("Plaintiff") and Defendant National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. ("Defendant"). Plaintiff and Defendant request sixty (60) days to file dismissal documents. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant must file dismissal documents no later than March 25, 2022, or else a joint status report informing the Court of the status of settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby VACATED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
January 24, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. by Jesus Gonzalez re #25 Amended Complaint. (Haines, George)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Stipulation of Dismissal of Trans Union LLC with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 20, 2022 Filing 90 STIPULATION of Dismissal with TransUnion re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
January 18, 2022 Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/18/2022. The parties have not complied with the Court's order at ECF No. 71. Accordingly, the parties must file a stipulation to dismiss Trans Union LLC by 1/21/2022. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -RA)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Re: #87 Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 10, 2022 Filing 87 STATUS REPORT with Clarity Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting #85 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 27, 2021 Filing 85 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Conn Appliances, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Michael Infuso and Keith W Barlow for National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange substituted for Attorney Jeremy J. Thompson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Michael V. Infuso in for Attorney Jeremy J. Thompson by Defendant National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange. (Infuso, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting #81 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List as to Attorneys Michael Feder and Gabriel Blumberg for Defendant Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/6/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG)
December 3, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION to remove attorney Michael N. Feder and Gabriel A. Blumberg from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
December 1, 2021 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thompson, Jeremy)
December 1, 2021 Filing 79 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange.(Thompson, Jeremy)
November 23, 2021 Filing 78 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 23, 2021 Filing 77 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-01068-GMN-BNW. (no image attached) (MR)
November 23, 2021 Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/23/2021. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Stipulation of Dismissal of Equifax Information Services LLC with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #72 Stipulation of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 18, 2021 Filing 73 STIPULATION of Dismissal w/ Equifax re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
November 18, 2021 Filing 72 STIPULATION of Dismissal w/ Experian re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Re: #70 Notice of settlement between Plaintiff and Trans Union, LLC. Stipulation to Dismiss documents are due by 1/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Trans Union, LLC by Jesus Gonzalez re #1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Re: #68 Notice. IT IS ORDERED that a stipulation to dismiss Clarity Services Inc. is due by 1/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 9, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of settlement w/ Clarity Services, Inc. by Jesus Gonzalez re #1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
October 28, 2021 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Gonzalez re #4 Summons Issued. Great American Finance Holdings, LLC served on 8/18/2021. (Haines, George)
October 20, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of settlement with Conn Appliances, Inc. by Jesus Gonzalez re #1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
October 13, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. RE: Plain Green, LLC (Avalos, Gerardo)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal w/ Backgroundchecks.com re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER - Stipulation to Dismiss is due by 11/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Gonzalez re #25 Amended Complaint. Plain Green, LLC served on 8/25/2021. (Haines, George)
September 29, 2021 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Gonzalez re #1 Complaint,,. Great American Finance Holdings, LLC served on 7/19/2021. (Haines, George)
September 29, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of settlement w/ Equifax by Jesus Gonzalez re #1 Complaint,,. (Haines, George)
September 29, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 6/7/2021.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Great American Finance Holdings, LLC, and Plain Green, LLC.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 10/29/2021. (MAJ)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must file dismissal documents or submit a joint status report by 11/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 27, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Settlement with Experian by Jesus Gonzalez. (Avalos, Gerardo)
September 21, 2021 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Stay Case re #25 Amended Complaint by Defendant Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
September 16, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. of Cash Factory, USA (Avalos, Gerardo)
September 16, 2021 Filing 52 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
September 16, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #49 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 2/2/2022. Motions due by 3/4/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 49 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Avalos, Gerardo)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Extend Time; 2233 Paradise Road, LLC dba Cash Factory USA answer due 9/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 13, 2021 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thompson, Jeremy)
September 13, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #40 Stipulation of Dismissal of Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 13, 2021 Filing 44 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to #25 Amended Complaint by Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. (Hernandez, Ramir) Modified on 9/13/2021 (EDS).
September 13, 2021 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 2233 Paradise Road, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Perpetual Green, LLC, Corporate Parent Cash Brothers, LLC, Corporate Parent Green Relativity, LLC, Corporate Parent 2233 Paradise Road Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Brent Christopher Berge 2012 TR DTD, Other Affiliate John Hashman for 2233 Paradise Road, LLC added. (Hernandez, Ramir)
September 13, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. (Hernandez, Ramir)
September 10, 2021 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clarity Services, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Corporate Parent Experian Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Clarity Services, Inc. added. (Gordon, Benjamin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal w/ Cox Communications, Inc re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Haines, George)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to #25 Amended Complaint. Conn Appliances, Inc. answer due 9/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, #25 Amended Complaint by Defendant Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 8, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint filed by Clarity Services, Inc..(Gordon, Benjamin)
September 8, 2021 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to file Answer re #1 Complaint,, #25 Amended Complaint by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re: #25 Amended Complaint. Backgroundchecks.com, LLC answer due 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 3, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading to #25 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Backgroundchecks.com, LLC. (Dickinson, Diana) Modified on 9/3/2021 (EDS).
August 26, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Gordon, Benjamin)
August 26, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
August 19, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AT&T Mobility, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Jacob)
August 17, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC.(Clark, Jacob) Modified on 8/17/2021 (EDS).
August 12, 2021 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Backgroundchecks.com, LLC, Clarity Services, Inc. re #25 First Amended Complaint. (MR)
August 12, 2021 Filing 27 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Clarity Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Avalos, Gerardo)
August 12, 2021 Filing 26 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Backgroundchecks.com LLC by Plaintiff Jesus Gonzalez. (Avalos, Gerardo)
August 12, 2021 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Parties by Jesus Gonzalez. Adds new parties. (Avalos, Gerardo)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc. answer due 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, Trans Union, LLC answer due 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, 2233 Paradise Road, LLC answer due 9/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint, Conn Appliances, Inc. answer due 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 6, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
August 6, 2021 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION For Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant 2233 Paradise Road, LLC. (Ivie, Benjamin)
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Gordon, Benjamin)
August 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2021.(Gordon, Benjamin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange answer due 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to Respond Re: #1 Complaint, Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 Amended STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #7 Stipulation by Defendant Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/5/2021. Before the Court is a stipulation to extend the time for defendant Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc. to respond to the complaint. ECF No. #7 . Under the Local Rules, "[a] motion or stipulation to extend time must state the reasons for the extension requested." LR IA 6-1(a). Here, the parties offer no reason for the requested extension. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #7 is DENIED without prejudice. The parties may re-file their stipulation if it conforms to the Local Rules. Conversely, and on the basis of good cause, IT IS ORDERED that the joint motion at ECF No. #8 and joint stipulation at ECF No. #9 are GRANTED. The deadline for defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to respond to the complaint is extended to 9/7/2021; the deadline for defendant National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. to respond to the complaint is extended to 9/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time for National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange to file Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange. (Thompson, Jeremy)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to file Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and [Proposed Order) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Conn Appliances, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Conn's, Inc. for Conn Appliances, Inc. added. (Hernandez, Ramir)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Hernandez, Ramir)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint (HAM)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jesus Gonzalez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6513583) by Jesus Gonzalez. Proof of service due by 9/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 7, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Clarity Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications Las Vegas, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel A. Blumberg
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Bradwell Gordon
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn Appliances, Inc.
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2233 Paradise Road, LLC doing business as Cash Factory USA
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Ivie
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarity Services, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Bradwell Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Finance Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plain Green, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Jacob G. Clark
Represented By: Robert E Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backgroundchecks.com, LLC
Represented By: Diana Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?