Bascom v. Saul
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Bascom
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv01073
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Ann Bascom re #6 Summons Issued as to USA, #5 Complaint. (HAM)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Andrew Saul served on 6/15/2021. (HAM)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipts to the Social Security Administration and the Attorney General of the United States re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (HAM)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint (HAM)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Patricia Ann Bascom. Proof of service due by 9/6/2021. (HAM)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is instructed to file the complaint. The Clerk of Court is instructed to serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and complaint by certified mail to: (1) Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear St., Suite 899, San Francisco, California 94105-1545; and (2) the Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Room 4400, Washington, D.C. 20530. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AF)
June 8, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AF)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Patricia Ann Bascom. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Patricia Ann Bascom. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified on 6/8/2021 (AF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bascom v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Bascom
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?