Phillips v. Ochoa et al
Plaintiff: T. Matthew Phillips
Defendant: Hutchison Steffen Law Firm, Vincent Ochoa, Shannon Wilson and Amber Korpak
Case Number: 2:2021cv01127
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
2 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
3 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/9/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #9 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Hutchison Steffen Law Firm, Amber Korpak, Shannon Wilson. Responses due by 8/20/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amber Phillips now known as Amber Korpak, Application for a Temporary and/or Extended Order for Protection Against Domestic Violence filed Sept. 17, 2018, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Temporary Order for Protection Against Domestic Violence filed Sept. 18, 2018, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Amber Phillips now known as Amber Korpak Application for an Extended Protection Order Against Domestic Violence filed Oct. 8, 2018, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Return of Service filed Oct. 23, 2018, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Amended Protection Order Against Domestic Violence (Continued) filed Oct. 18, 2018, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Protection Order Against Domestic Violence filed Nov. 2, 2018, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Decision & Order, Findings of Fact, and Conclusions of Law filed Nov. 5, 2018, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Extended Order for Protection Against Domestic Violence filed Nov. 13, 2018, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Amber Phillips now known as Amber Korpaks Opposition to Defendants Third Request to Continue Trial filed Aug. 9, 2019, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Decree of Divorce filed Sept. 27, 2019, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Protection Order Against Domestic Violence, filed Sept. 16, 2019, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - Order Denying Pet. for Writ of Prohibition filed Oct. 8, 2019, Case No. 79709-COA, Ct. App. Nev) (Prall, Todd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff T. Matthew Phillips. (YAW)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying #6 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case No. 2:21-cv-01127-GMN-DJA is transferred to District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IFP Application/Payment of filing fees due 7/15/2021. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/22/2021. (Attachments: IFP Instructions/Application forms to P) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Notice/Consent to Email) (MR)
June 15, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by T. Matthew Phillips. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (MR)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Motion to File Electronically) (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Ochoa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchison Steffen Law Firm
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Wilson
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Korpak
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Matthew Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?