McNeese v. Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff: Bonnie McNeese
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01183
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Trans Union, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/26/2021.(Bergh, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint, Trans Union, LLC answer due 8/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #6 filed by attorney Jennifer Bergh. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion Extend/Shorten Time to Stipulation. No further action is required. (no image attached) (SLD)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holding, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (SLD).
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Trans Union to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified event on 7/15/2021 (SLD).
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonnie McNeese re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued. Trans Union, LLC served on 6/24/2021. (Krieger, David)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC re #1 Complaint. (HAM)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bonnie McNeese. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6532085) by Bonnie McNeese. Proof of service due by 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Trans Union) (Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 22, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeese v. Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie McNeese
Represented By: Shawn Wayne Miller
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Represented By: Trevor Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?