Arizmendi Martinez v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Arizmendi Martinez
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01199
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #6 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/27/2021. Motions due by 1/26/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/7/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Busby, Jerry)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/28/2021. Defendant filed an answer roughly five months prior to removal. Docket No. 1 at 2. A discovery plan must be filed by July 7, 2021. In addition to the requirements for the discovery plan established in the local rules, the discovery plan must also identify any discovery that took place prior to removal and must attach any scheduling order issued by the state court prior to removal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/25/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-827093-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6536029) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Busby, Jerry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizmendi Martinez v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Arizmendi Martinez
Represented By: Brandon Verde
Represented By: Eric R. Blank
Represented By: Darren J Lach
Represented By: Darren John Lach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?