VonSeydewitz v. Ascenda USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frederick VonSeydewitz
Defendant: Ascenda USA, Inc. doing business as 24-7 Intouch, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01203
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Strike by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. (McClane, Lisa)
August 6, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to #22 Response to #16 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. (HAM)
August 4, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to #18 Response to #13 Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. (HAM)
August 3, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. Replies due by 8/10/2021. (HAM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #16 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. Replies due by 8/9/2021. (McClane, Lisa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit) (Massey, Marian)
July 27, 2021 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Defendant's Status Report by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. (McClane, Lisa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 Counter MOTION to Strike #13 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. Responses due by 8/10/2021. (McClane, Lisa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #13 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. (McClane, Lisa)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #10 Motion by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. Replies due by 7/27/2021. (McClane, Lisa)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. (HAM)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to #14 Response to #4 Motion to Remand to Agency by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. (HAM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Remand to Agency by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. Replies due by 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit) (McClane, Lisa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. (HAM)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. (McClane, Lisa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. (McClane, Lisa)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. Responses due by 7/20/2021. (HAM)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. Replies due by 7/9/2021. (HAM)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/2/2021. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #5 is DENIED without prejudice under LR 15-1(a). LR 15-1(a) provides, in part, "Unless the court orders otherwise, the moving party must attach the proposed amended pleading to a motion seeking leave of the court to file an amended pleading." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to refile his motion to amend, he must first meet and confer with Defendant and include a LR IA 1-3(f) certification regarding their meeting and inability to reach an agreement. See LR 16-1(d). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/30/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #6 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Ascenda USA, Inc.. Responses due by 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Marc Lloyd, #5 Exhibit D - Nevada Secretary of State Print Out, #6 Exhibit E - Default, #7 Exhibit F - Motion for Default Judgment) (McClane, Lisa)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. Responses due by 7/13/2021. (HAM)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Frederick VonSeydewitz. Responses due by 7/13/2021. (HAM)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/25/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-834778-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6536760) by Ascenda USA, Inc., dba 24-7 Intouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons & Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) (McClane, Lisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VonSeydewitz v. Ascenda USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascenda USA, Inc. doing business as 24-7 Intouch, Inc.
Represented By: Marian Massey
Represented By: Lisa A McClane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick VonSeydewitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?