Wright v. Saul
Plaintiff: Laura B. Wright
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv01235
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 3090 0001 1133 1767 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 3090 0001 1133 1774 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Talbert, Daniel)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. USAO served on 7/12/2021. (MR)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 3090 0001 1133 1774 and 7018 3090 0001 1133 1767 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA re #5 Complaint. (MR)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (cc: USM for Service to AUSA w/ECFs #4 , #5 - MR)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Laura B. Wright. (MR)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court file #1 -1 the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue summons to the US Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SLD)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laura B. Wright. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Laura B. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified on 7/1/2021 (SLD).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura B. Wright
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?