Callaway v. Saul
Plaintiff: Edna B Callaway
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv01237
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edna B Callaway. Andrew Saul served on 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (EDS).
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul re #5 Complaint. (YAW)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Edna B Callaway. Proof of service due by 10/17/2021. (YAW)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) shall proceed against Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall detach and file Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service to file his answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SLD)
June 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (SLD)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Edna B Callaway. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Edna B Callaway. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified on 7/1/2021 (SLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callaway v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna B Callaway
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?