Cox v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Latrina C. Cox
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv01244
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 USM Return Executed/Unexecuted re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Commissioner Of Social Security served on 7/30/2021. (DRS)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sathya Oum on behalf of Defendant Commissioner Of Social Security. (Oum, Sathya)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipts Returned 7018 3090 0001 1133 2849 and 7018 3090 0001 1133 2788 re #8 Summons Issued as to USA, #7 Summons Issued as to USA. (DRS)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 3090 0001 1133 2849 and 7018 3090 0001 1133 2788 for #7 , #8 Summons Issued as to USA re #5 Complaint. (MR)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX re #5 Complaint. (YAW)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (YAW)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney re #5 Complaint. (YAW)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security by Latrina C. Cox. Proof of service due by 10/17/2021. (YAW)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff will not be required to pay the filing fee of $402.00. Plaintiff is permitted to maintain this action to conclusion without the necessity of prepayment of any additional fees or costs or giving security for them. The Clerk of Court must file the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court must serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court must issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: copies of Order/Summons/Complaint to USMS; Summons/Complaint served via certified mail to SSA Commissioner; copy of Order to Finance Dept. - YAW)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Latrina C. Cox. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Latrina C. Cox. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal)
July 1, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrina C. Cox
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?