Steinberg et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Valtus Real Estate, LLC and Maxwell Steinberg
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Sables, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01249
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Tentative and Pending Settlement by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Garabedian, Jory)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Garabedian, Jory)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Garabedian, Jory)
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Non-Monetary Status re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Sables, LLC. (Dolembo, John)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sables, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dolembo, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time: #1 Petition for Removal (Complaint) - Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC answer due 8/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Garabedian, Jory)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Garabedian, Jory)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Carrington Companies, LLC, Other Affiliate Carrington Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Carrington Investment Partners, LP, Other Affiliate Carrington Capital Management, LLC for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC added. (Garabedian, Jory)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/6/2021. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant Carrington Mortgage failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Defendant Carrington Mortgage must file a certificate of interested parties no later than July 9, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/1/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/16/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-835988-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6543611) by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O) (Garabedian, Jory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 1, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinberg et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Jory C. Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sables, LLC
Represented By: John S. Dolembo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valtus Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Steinberg
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?