King et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Caroline King, William Dee King, Tenesha King and Estate of William Nesbit King
Defendant: USA and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01285
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Caroline King, Tenesha King, William Dee King. (Laird, Danial)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (AF)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs Caroline King, Tenesha King, William Dee King. (Laird, Danial)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) (Laird, Danial)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 7/28/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (MR)
July 7, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Estate of William Nesbit King, Caroline King, Tenesha King, William Dee King. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Laird, Danial)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6547773) by Caroline King, Estate of William Nesbit King, Tenesha King, William Dee King. Proof of service due by 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Laird, Danial) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline King
Represented By: Danial O. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dee King
Represented By: Danial O. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenesha King
Represented By: Danial O. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of William Nesbit King
Represented By: Danial O. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?