Alvarez Gutierrez v. Saul
Plaintiff: Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv01292
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipt executed and returned by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration re #7 Notice of Certified Mail Receipts and #4 Order as to Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez. (YAW)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah Wyeth McAdam on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (McAdam, Sarah)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 7/16/2021 by Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez. (YAW)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipts Nos. 7018 3090 0001 1133 1811 and No. 7018 3090 0001 1133 1828 re #4 Order as to Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez. (YAW)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DRS)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez. (DRS)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USMS - DRS)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez Gutierrez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguelangel Alvarez Gutierrez
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Sarah Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?