Shankle et al v. The Heights of Summerlin, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kashif Shankle, Rita Esparza, Alfred Esparza, Leonard Esparza, Maris Esparza, Lilianna Esparza, Leticia Esparza and Maria Esparza
Defendant: The Heights of Summerlin, LLC, Summit Care, LLC, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., Latoya Davis and Andrew Reese
Case Number: 2:2021cv01316
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #22 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Motions due by 5/16/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/8/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Alfred Esparza, Leonard Esparza, Leticia Esparza, Lilianna Esparza, Maria Esparza, Kashif Shankle. (Davidson, Hunter)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying #19 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiffs Alfred Esparza, Leonard Esparza, Leticia Esparza, Lilianna Esparza, Maria Esparza, Kashif Shankle. (Davidson, Hunter)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Alfred Esparza, Leonard Esparza, Leticia Esparza, Lilianna Esparza, Maria Esparza, Kashif Shankle. (Davidson, Hunter)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendants Latoya Davis, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., Andrew Reese, Summit Care, LLC, The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. Replies due by 9/1/2021. (Christopher, Margaret)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF FED R. CIV. P. 26(F) CASE CONFERENCE by Alfred Esparza, Leonard Esparza, Leticia Esparza, Lilianna Esparza, Maria Esparza, Kashif Shankle. (Davidson, Hunter)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Latoya Davis, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., Andrew Reese, Summit Care, LLC, The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. (Christopher, Margaret)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Alfred Esparza, Leonard Esparza, Leticia Esparza, Lilianna Esparza, Maria Esparza. Responses due by 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Errata to Complaint) (Davidson, Hunter)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINDER to #13 Reply by Defendants Summit Care, LLC and Genesis Healthcare, Inc. (Christopher, Margaret) Modified to add additional filer on 8/10/2021 (SLD).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants The Heights of Summerlin, LLC, Latoya Davis, and Andrew Reese. (Christopher, Margaret) Modified on 8/9/2021 to add additional filers (SLD).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Alfred Esparza, Leonard Esparza, Leticia Esparza, Lilianna Esparza, Maria Esparza, Kashif Shankle. Replies due by 8/9/2021. (Davidson, Hunter)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Latoya Davis, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., Andrew Reese, Summit Care, LLC, The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. (Christopher, Margaret)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Summit Care, LLC. Responses due by 8/4/2021. (Christopher, Margaret)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. Responses due by 8/2/2021. (Christopher, Margaret)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re filing of #6 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Margaret Christopher is advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. No further action is required at this time. The Court has added the Interested Parties. (no image attached) (SLD)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Genesis Healthcare, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Summit Care, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Summit Care Parent, LLC and Genesis Healthcare, Inc. added. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Christopher, Margaret) Modified on 7/13/2021 (SLD).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Latoya Davis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrew Reese. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/13/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/28/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth District, Case Number A-21-836257-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6554910) by Andrew Reese, Summit Care, LLC, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., The Heights of Summerlin, LLC, Latoya Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W) (Christopher, Margaret) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shankle et al v. The Heights of Summerlin, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashif Shankle
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Esparza
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Esparza
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maris Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilianna Esparza
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Esparza
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Esparza
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heights of Summerlin, LLC
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Derek Linford
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Care, LLC
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Davis
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Reese
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?